NH HB344 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-18 - Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 02:15 pm State House Reps Hall
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/26/2023 02:15 pm State House Reps Hall
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback