NH HB329 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring parental notification before abortions may be performed on unemancipated minors.
Title
Requiring parental notification before abortions may be performed on unemancipated minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - SHALL HB 329 BECOME LAW (Y: 266 N: 102 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 2170s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 2052s (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0531H (Y: 256 N: 102 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - SHALL HB 329 BECOME LAW (Y: 266 N: 102 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 2170s (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 2052s (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0531H (Y: 256 N: 102 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0205 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall HB 329 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds | |
2011-06-22 | House Veto Overridden: Regular Calendar 266-102 By Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 57, PG.1830-1833 | |
2011-06-16 | House Vetoed By Governor 06/15/2011; House Calendar 49, PG.1681-1682 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.391 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.387 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-2170s, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 18, Pg.387 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-2052s, New Title, Regular Calendar 8Y-16N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 18, Pg.386 | |
2011-05-13 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/25/11; Senate Calendar 25 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Hearing: 4/21/11, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11, Pg.191 | |
2011-03-16 | House Reconsideration (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.949 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0531h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 256-102; House Journal 28, PG.875-878 | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment #0531h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.875-876 | |
2011-03-09 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.557-558 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0531h; House Calendar 23, PG.600-601 | |
2011-03-09 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0531h for Mar 15 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.557-558 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/28/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 182 |