NH HB314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to homestead food operation licensure.
Title
Relative to homestead food operation licensure.
Sponsors
Rep. Rene Nunez [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Tim Baxter [R] |
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-02-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94852322897 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB314 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207