NH HB306 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB306
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 97; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 97; eff. 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting reunification therapy.
Title
Relative to prohibiting reunification therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] | Rep. Oliver Ford [R] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. JD Bernardy [R] |
Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 97; eff. 07/01/2024 |
2024-06-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/16/2024; Senate Journal 13 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Special Order to 05/16/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024 Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2306h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 32 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2306h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 32 |
2023-11-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2306h 10/31/2023 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 2 |
2023-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 41 |
2023-08-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 10 |
Same As/Similar To
HB306 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - Retained in Committee