NH HB306 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB306
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting reunification therapy.
Title
Relative to prohibiting reunification therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] | Rep. Oliver Ford [R] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. JD Bernardy [R] |
Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 10 |
Same As/Similar To
HB306 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - Retained in Committee