NH HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Conferee Change; Senator Levesque Replaces Senator Chandley; Senate Journal 21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a special marriage officiant license and relative to the assignment of temporary justices to the supreme court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special marriage officiant license and relative to the assignment of temporary justices to the supreme court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 155 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 154 N: 215 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateConferee Change; Senator Levesque Replaces Senator Chandley; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-12HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-06-11SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Hennessey, Chandley, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-11SenateSen. Hennessey Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Woodbury, Burroughs, Gordon, Berch 06/06/2019
2019-06-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1966s and Requests CofC (Reps. M. Smith, Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1966s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1966s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1966s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1966s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-155 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 32
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1205h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 154-215 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 32
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1205h
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 206-138 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-01-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-01-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16
2019-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building208
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=15&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB295
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=15&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=15
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=152&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0295&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB295&ddlsponsors=&lsr=15
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=153&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0295&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB295&ddlsponsors=&lsr=15
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=175&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0295&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB295&ddlsponsors=&lsr=15
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=176&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0295&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB295&ddlsponsors=&lsr=15

Bill Comments

feedback