NH HB287 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB287

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study decriminalizing sex work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study decriminalizing sex work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 177 N: 134 NV: 49 Abs: 32) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-14SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018;
2018-03-14SenateSpecial Order to 03/15/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2018 Senate Journal 7
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-02-14SenateHearing: 02/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 8
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2524h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-134 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 3
2018-01-09HouseAmendment # 2017-2524h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 2
2018-01-03HouseSpecial Order to first order of business on 1/9/2018 (Rep. White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 54
2017-11-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2524h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)
2017-09-06HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-09-06HouseExecutive Session: 11/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-06-07HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-31HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-17HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 05/23/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-02-15HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-02-08House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2017 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 7

Same As/Similar To

HB287 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2524h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=736&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB287
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=720&txtFormat=html
Texthttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=720
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=14&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0287&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB287&ddlsponsors=&lsr=736
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=125&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0287&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB287&ddlsponsors=&lsr=736
Roll Callhttps://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=126&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB0287&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB287&ddlsponsors=&lsr=736

Bill Comments

feedback