NH HB287 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2524h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study decriminalizing sex work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study decriminalizing sex work.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2524h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar)
2017-09-06HouseExecutive Session: 11/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-09-06HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-06-07HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-31HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 06/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-17HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 05/23/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-02-15HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-02-08House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2017 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback