NH HB287 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation for funding disaster relief and hazard mitigation in response to the May 2006 Suncook River avulsion.
Title
Making an appropriation for funding disaster relief and hazard mitigation in response to the May 2006 Suncook River avulsion.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Giuda [R] | Rep. John McDonnell [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] |
Rep. Jon Richardson [R] | Rep. Brian Seaworth [R] | Rep. Tony Soltani [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.418 | |
2011-09-28 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2208 | |
2011-08-24 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 201 Following House Session | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2011-02-09 | House Vacated from Finance and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 16, PG.308 | |
2011-01-31 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/14/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 11, PG. 180 |