NH HB278 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to town clerk fees for fill and dredge permit applications.
Title
Relative to town clerk fees for fill and dredge permit applications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 801 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 407 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |