NH HB266 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study removing child custody cases which involve abuse or neglect from the jurisdiction of the family court and probate court divisions.
Title
Establishing a committee to study removing child custody cases which involve abuse or neglect from the jurisdiction of the family court and probate court divisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 12 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-27 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-05-13 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |