NH HB261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 208; Eff: 10/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 208; Eff: 10/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to arsenic contamination in drinking water.
Title
Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to arsenic contamination in drinking water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 208; Eff: 10/10/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1983s and 2243s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1983s and 2019-2243s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-2243s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1983s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1983s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0028h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 30 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0028h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 30 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0028h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 43 |