NH HB253 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB253

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 31; Eff: 09/22/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal records checks in the employee application process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to criminal records checks in the employee application process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 31; Eff: 09/22/2020
2020-07-06HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020
2020-07-06SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-11HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Sullivan): Motion Adopted DV 192-137 06/11/2020
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0323s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateSen. French Floor Amendment # 2020-0323s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateSen. French Moved Ought to Pass; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-15SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-08SenateSen. French Moved to Special Order to 01/30/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
2019-11-20SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47
2019-04-18SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0246h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-142 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 64
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0246h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 64
2019-02-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0246h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 43

Same As/Similar To

HB253 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback