NH HB253 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB253
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal records checks in the employee application process.
Title
Relative to criminal records checks in the employee application process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 213 N: 142 NV: 26 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0246h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-142 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 64 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0246h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 64 |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0246h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB253 (Carry Over) 2019-11-20 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study