NH HB251 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 135; Eff: 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study requiring New Hampshire children to be placed in rear facing restraints in motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study requiring New Hampshire children to be placed in rear facing restraints in motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Senate - Special Order (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 176 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Table Two (Y: 179 N: 197 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 135; Eff: 07/23/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1229s (Rep. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 19
2021-05-13SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1229s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
2021-05-13SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1229s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1229s, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23
2021-05-06SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Special Order to 05/13/21, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-05-06SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Remove HB 251 from the Consent Calendar; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1229s, 05/06/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-15SenateRemote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-09HouseReconsider (Rep. T. Smith): Motion Failed DV 143-227 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 62
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0652h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-176 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 60
2021-04-09HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Belanger): Motion Failed DV 180-195 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 58
2021-04-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 179-197 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 56
2021-04-09HouseAmendment # 2021-0652h: Amendment Adopted DV 232-137 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 55
2021-04-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed DV 181-188 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 55
2021-03-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0652h (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 61
2021-03-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994
2021-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98796113084 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=308&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB251
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=306&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=306
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=306
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=136&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0251&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB251&ddlsponsors=&lsr=308
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=138&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0251&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB251&ddlsponsors=&lsr=308
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=366&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0251&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB251&ddlsponsors=&lsr=308

Bill Comments

feedback