NH HB251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB251
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal background checks for education personnel.
Title
Relative to criminal background checks for education personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)