NH HB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2019; Chapter 146; I. Sec.20 Eff: 06/30/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2019; Chapter 146; I. Sec.20 Eff: 06/30/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Making appropriations for capital improvements.
Title
Making appropriations for capital improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 362 N: 5 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 362 N: 5 NV: 19 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2019; Chapter 146; I. Sec.20 Eff: 06/30/2019 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2637e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 21 |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2637e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2209s (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2209s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2209s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2209s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced 04/18/2019 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1373h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 362-5 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 1 |
2019-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2019-1373h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 1 |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1373h for 04/11/2019 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 3 |
2019-03-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 04/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/29/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-11 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/14/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-03-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/13/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-26 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by House by the Necessary 2/3 Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 44 |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced 02/14/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 5 P. 80 |