NH HB248 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the university system of New Hampshire to conduct a study of the effects of prolonged human consumption of and exposure to methyl tertiary butyl ether (MTBE).
Title
Directing the university system of New Hampshire to conduct a study of the effects of prolonged human consumption of and exposure to methyl tertiary butyl ether (MTBE).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 783 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 398-399 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |