NH HB245 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study state and county departments of corrections.
Title
Establishing a committee to study state and county departments of corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. David Wood [R] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Frederick Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 307 |
2015-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 179 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |