NH HB244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the membership and duties of the joint health care reform oversight committee.
Title
Relative to the membership and duties of the joint health care reform oversight committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 11 |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7 |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94563888809 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:20 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94852322897 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 40 |