NH HB243 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1371s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the form of municipal budgets, relative to municipal estimates of expenditures and revenues, and relative to the requirement that certain governing bodies submit recommendations to the budget committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the form of municipal budgets, relative to municipal estimates of expenditures and revenues, and relative to the requirement that certain governing bodies submit recommendations to the budget committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1371s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2021-04-14SenateRemote Hearing: 04/19/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-09HouseReconsider (Rep. Piemonte): Motion Failed DV 179-194 04/09/2021
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0546h: Motion Adopted DV 189-186 04/09/2021
2021-04-09HouseAmendment # 2021-0546h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021
2021-03-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0546h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 56
2021-03-03House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 03/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98208993032 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-01House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 12:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97119253057 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-02-08House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/18/2021 09:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94522837794 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback