NH HB237 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/18/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the date of asset evaluation for purposes of determining eligibility for certain property tax exemptions.
Title
Relative to the date of asset evaluation for purposes of determining eligibility for certain property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/19/2023; Chapter 39; Eff: 07/18/2023 |
2023-05-17 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/09/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7 |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 8 |