NH HB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 24; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 24; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire rare disease advisory council.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire rare disease advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 24; Eff: 07/14/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0405h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 14 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0405h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-06 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42 |