NH HB234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-19 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to food service licensure.
Title
Relative to food service licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 (If Necessary Continued 10/27/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302) | |
2011-10-19 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 10/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-09-20 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-06-22 | House Retained Bill - Banking/Business Div Subcom Work Session: 9/20/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-15 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.822 | |
2011-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/15/2011 Legislative Office Building 302 3:00 PM or Immediately Following House Session | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 178 |