NH HB232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-132 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-132 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of immigration laws and the prohibition of sanctuary policies.
Title
Relative to enforcement of immigration laws and the prohibition of sanctuary policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 211 N: 132 NV: 15 Abs: 42) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-132 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2019-02-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0190h |
2019-02-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 21 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 42 |