NH HB230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Lay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted DV 178-142 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting smoking in motor vehicles when a passenger is under 16 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting smoking in motor vehicles when a passenger is under 16 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseLay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted DV 178-142 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 42
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60
2019-02-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-02-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback