NH HB226 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 257-90 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 257-90 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling municipalities to regulate the distribution and disposal of certain solid waste within landfills.
Title
Enabling municipalities to regulate the distribution and disposal of certain solid waste within landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucius Parshall [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] |
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 257 N: 90 NV: 21 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 257 N: 90 NV: 24 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 257 N: 90 NV: 24 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 257-90 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB226 02/09/2023 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 24 |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 7 |