NH HB225 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 07/02/2013; Chapter 0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 07/02/2013; Chapter 0174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rulemaking authority of the liquor commission.
Title
Relative to the rulemaking authority of the liquor commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 07/02/2013; Chapter 0174 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1147s (Rep Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1562 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1147s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1147s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1147s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 3/13/13, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.307 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 6 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.154 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.187 |