NH HB222 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Summary
Relative to fill and dredge permits in wetlands.
Title
Relative to fill and dredge permits in wetlands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-13 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-13 | House Refer to Interim Study (Rep Spang): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.420-421 | |
2010-01-13 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.420-421 | |
2010-01-13 | House Majority Committee Amendment #2010-0006h (New Title) Failed, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.420-421 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-25 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 2, PG.98 | |
2009-11-25 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2010-0006h (New Title); House Calendar 1, PG.8 | |
2009-11-25 | House Majority Committee Rept: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2010-0006h (NT) for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 11-9); House Calendar2, PG.98 | |
2009-11-23 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/24/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-11-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/24/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-11-10 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/23/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-11-09 | House Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment: 11/19/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307 | |
2009-11-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment: 11/17/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-11-02 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/16/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-11-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 11/10/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-03-18 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-12 | House Executive Session: 3/17/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 (Continued 3/18/09 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 If Needed) | |
2009-03-12 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/16/2009 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-03-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/12/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-02-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/10/2009 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-01-28 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2009 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-01-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/27/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-01-08 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/22/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-01-07 | House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 8, PG.125 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=810&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |