NH HB220 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 131; Eff: 07/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to medical freedom in immunizations and establishing a committee to examine the policy of medical intervention including immunizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to medical freedom in immunizations and establishing a committee to examine the policy of medical intervention including immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - Concur (Y: 198 N: 162 NV: 10 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 131; Eff: 07/23/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1595s (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-162 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 10
2021-05-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1595s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1595s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1595s, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25
2021-04-08SenateRemote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0575h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 35
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0575h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 35
2021-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0575h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 15
2021-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/02/2021 12:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99282187833
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92769044991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=206&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB220
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=202&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=202
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=202
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=392&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0220&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB220&ddlsponsors=&lsr=206
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=393&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0220&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB220&ddlsponsors=&lsr=206
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=391&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=HB0220&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB220&ddlsponsors=&lsr=206
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=186&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0220&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB220&ddlsponsors=&lsr=206

Bill Comments

feedback