NH HB218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 277-62 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of deadly force by a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of deadly force by a law enforcement officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 277 N: 62 NV: 16 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 277-62 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 49
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 27
2019-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-16HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-09House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-02HousePublic Hearing: 01/09/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building204
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback