NH HB218 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to additional funding for third grade proficiency in mathematics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to additional funding for third grade proficiency in mathematics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-11-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2441h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 17
2015-09-09HouseExecutive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-08-17HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/1/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-08-17HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/27/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-05-12HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2015-05-05HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-04-21HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-02-11HouseRetained in Committee
2015-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-14House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 1/20/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 213

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback