NH HB216 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 12; Eff. 6/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to educational assignments for pupils who have been suspended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to educational assignments for pupils who have been suspended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 04/17/2017; Chapter 12; Eff. 6/16/2017
2017-04-11HouseEnrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63
2017-04-06SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14
2017-03-29SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-15SenateHearing: 03/21/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0512h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 19
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0512h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 19
2017-02-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0512h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 10
2017-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 207
2017-02-08HousePublic Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-02-02HouseRecommit (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 12
2017-01-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-01-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/02/2017 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7
2017-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 01/19/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2016-12-30HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback