NH HB216 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/31/2011; Effective 07/30/2011; Chapter 0108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the instructional authority of school boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the instructional authority of school boards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-01 House Signed By Governor 05/31/2011; Effective 07/30/2011; Chapter 0108
2011-05-18 House Enrolled; House Journal 44, PG.1564
2011-05-18 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 18, Pg.364
2011-05-04 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312
2011-05-04 Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.299
2011-04-28 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22
2011-04-22 Senate Hearing: === RESCHEDULED === 4/26/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 21
2011-03-17 Senate Hearing: === CANCELLED === 3/22/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16
2011-03-09 Senate Hearing: 3/22/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15
2011-02-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8, Pg.81
2011-02-23 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0207h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.463-464
2011-02-23 House Amendment #0207h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.463-464
2011-02-16 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0207h; House Calendar 15, PG.299-300
2011-02-16 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0207h for Feb 23 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.273
2011-02-01 House Executive Session: 2/11/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-01-25 House Public Hearing: 2/4/2011 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2011-01-19 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 11, PG. 177

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback