NH HB209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the form required to request an absentee ballot.
Title
Relative to the form required to request an absentee ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 76 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/15/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24 |
2023-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Election Law |