NH HB208 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reconsider HB208 (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 186-187 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reconsider HB208 (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 186-187 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing greenhouse gas emission reduction goals for the state and establishing a climate action plan.
Title
Establishing greenhouse gas emission reduction goals for the state and establishing a climate action plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] |
Rep. David Preece [D] | Rep. William Darby [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 187 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reconsider HB208 (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 186-187 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 59 |
2023-03-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 192-181 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 55 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 183-187 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2023-03-16 | House | FLAM # 2023-1033H 185-186 (Rep. Creighton): Amendment Failed DV 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/16/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 15 |
2023-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |