NH HB204 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 341-3 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 341-3 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to review and update the penalties for contaminating drinking water and groundwater.
Title
Establishing a committee to review and update the penalties for contaminating drinking water and groundwater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - House - Table (Y: 341 N: 3 NV: 26 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 341-3 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 20 |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0924h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 31 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 41 |