NH HB200 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB200
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to choice of counselor to evaluate a child in family court proceedings.
Title
Relative to choice of counselor to evaluate a child in family court proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/11/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0010h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0010h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0010h 01/24/2023 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 2 |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2023 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14