NH HB196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 97; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 97; Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to proof of residency for fish and game purposes.
Title
Relative to proof of residency for fish and game purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 97; Eff: 08/20/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2019-1422s (Rep. Harvey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 2 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1422s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1422s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1422s, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0384h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 13 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0384h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 13 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0384h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 9 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 2 P. 41 |