NH HB195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 12
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 12
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to continuing care communities.
Title
Relative to continuing care communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 770 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 391 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/19/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/19/2015 8:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2015 8:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 211 |