NH HB189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accessory dwelling units.
Title
Relative to accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Rep. Ivy Vann [D] | Rep. Tony Caplan [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 14 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 10 |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94522837794 |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 12:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93215390740 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 38 |