NH HB186 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep Bates): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.739
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of political communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of political communication.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 House House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep Bates): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.739
2012-01-18 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2609s, New Title Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.68
2012-01-18 Senate Committee Amendment 2609s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.68
2012-01-12 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-2609s, New Title; 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3
2011-04-13 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.252
2011-04-06 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19
2011-03-29 Senate Hearing: 4/5/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.190
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0551h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.795
2011-03-15 House Amendment #0551h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.795
2011-03-09 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.551-552
2011-03-09 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0551h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.589
2011-03-09 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0551h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.551-552
2011-02-23 House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2011-01-26 House Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308
2011-01-11 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 11, PG.176

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback