NH HB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the oil discharge cleanup fund.
Title
Relative to the oil discharge cleanup fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 07/01/2013; Chapter 0037 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 5/2/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1024 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 27 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.706 |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-20 | House | Public Hearing: 2/28/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 16, PG.304-305 |
2013-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0074h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.304-305 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment #0074h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.304-305 |
2013-01-30 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0074h; House Calendar 11, PG.173 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0074h for Feb 6 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.152 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.186 |