NH HB1815 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for possession of marijuana.
Title
Relative to the penalties for possession of marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 7 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-4; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 24 |