NH HB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the house and senate members of the university system board of trustees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the house and senate members of the university system board of trustees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019
2019-01-29HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback