NH HB1762 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-19 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to documentation requirements for the department of labor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to documentation requirements for the department of labor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building307
2018-09-19HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building307
2018-03-21HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 30
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 74
2018-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/14/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2017-11-21HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback