NH HB176 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB176
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to grants for school building aid and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to grants for school building aid and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-02-15 | House | Finance-Division II Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Finance 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 29 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 29 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB176 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)