NH HB1749 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301
Hearing: Oct 10 @ 10:00 am in am Legislative Office Building301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state's authority to prohibit or regulate firearms and relative to the selectmen's authority to manage town property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state's authority to prohibit or regulate firearms and relative to the selectmen's authority to manage town property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - Interim Study (Y: 239 N: 71 NV: 54 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14HouseExecutive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building301
2018-08-28HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building301
2018-02-08HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 239-71 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 59
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/07/2018 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 24
2018-01-24House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/30/2018 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2018-01-24House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2018-01-03House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/10/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 am State House Reps Hall
2017-11-20HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback