NH HB1712 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 284-5; House Journal 26, PG.1643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 284-5; House Journal 26, PG.1643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the teaching of the Bible in public schools.
Title
Relative to the teaching of the Bible in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Bergevin [R] | Rep. Susan DeLemus [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Robert Kingsbury [R] |
Rep. Stella Tremblay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 284-5; House Journal 26, PG.1643 | |
2012-03-07 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Bergevin); House Journal 21, PG.1285 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1144 | |
2012-01-18 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2012-01-10 | House Introduced 1/11/2012 and Referred to Education; House Journal 9, PG.527 |