NH HB1709 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-17 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-17 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to physical force in defense of a person.
Title
Relative to physical force in defense of a person.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] |
Rep. John O'Day [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Michael Abbott [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204 |
2018-08-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 222-109 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 30 |
2018-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/22/2018 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 20 |